This case was last updated from Not Yet Classified on 06/29/2023 at 10:19:02 (UTC).

BIOSPINEvs.PERMANENT GENERAL ASSURANCE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 05/25/2023 BIOSPINEvs PERMANENT GENERAL ASSURANCE CORPORATION was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Not Yet Classified, Not Yet Classified. The Judge overseeing this case is Amanda S Bova. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************62-O

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Yet Classified

Judge Details

Judge

Amanda S Bova

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BIOSPINE

ELIJAH REYNOSO AAO

Defendant

PERMANENT GENERAL ASSURANCE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREGORY GUDIN

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Addendum to

Addendum to

Complaint

Complaint

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Landau Associates, P.A.; Amount: -380.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 380.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less