This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 11/10/2023 at 15:44:19 (UTC).

MRI AND 3D DIAGNOSTIC CENTER LLC vs. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/11/2023 MRI AND 3D DIAGNOSTIC CENTER LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Eric H DuBois. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************42-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Eric H DuBois

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MRI AND 3D DIAGNOSTIC CENTER LLC

JACOB JEAN BAPTISTE AAO

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREGORY GUDIN

Defendant Attorney

CASSIDY BIERBRODT

 

Court Documents

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed the attorney

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Complaint

Complaint

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Addendum to

Addendum to

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Admissions

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest to Produce

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDemand for Jury Trial

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
09/11/2023

FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Landau Associates, P.A.; Amount: -185.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023

FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest to Produce

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Admissions

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAddendum to

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023

DocketCase Initiated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less