This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 05/15/2023 at 18:33:39 (UTC).

KWON, AERANet al. vs. COWAN SYSTEMS LLCet al.

Case Summary

On 03/21/2023 KWON, AERAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against COWAN SYSTEMS LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Heather Pinder Rodriguez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************82-O

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Heather Pinder Rodriguez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AERAN KWON

BON KOO

Defendants

COWAN SYSTEMS LLC

SCOTT FORRESTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZACHARY VON ROENN

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed Issued Summon to the Attorney

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed Issued Summon to the Attorney

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed Issued Summon to the Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed Issued Summon to the Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketService Document Unable to be Issued; Comments: Per Admin Order No. 2021-04, a Standing Case Management Plan/Order for Streamlined or General civil cases must be submitted at time of filing. Please correct and resubmit the entire filing within 5 business days.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Zachary Warren Von Roenn; Amount: -420.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 420.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less