This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 11/28/2023 at 16:05:45 (UTC).

CAREFIRST IMAGING vs. AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/29/2023 CAREFIRST IMAGING filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew L Cameron. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************75-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Andrew L Cameron

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CAREFIRST IMAGING

BRIAN WEBER AAO

Defendant

AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREGORY GUDIN

Defendant Attorney

DAVID GAGNON

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Addendum to

Addendum to

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to attorney

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

11/13/2023

DocketVoluntary Dismissal

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketVoluntary Dismissal

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to attorney

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023

FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Landau Associates, P.A.; Amount: -65.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023

FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 65.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAddendum to

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatement of Claim

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023

DocketCase Initiated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less