This case was last updated from Not Yet Classified on 09/16/2023 at 15:58:47 (UTC).

PRESGAR IMAGING OF CMI SOUTH, LC vs. PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/18/2023 PRESGAR IMAGING OF CMI SOUTH, LC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Not Yet Classified, Not Yet Classified. The Judge overseeing this case is Amanda S Bova. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************11-O

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Not Yet Classified

Judge Details

Judge

Amanda S Bova

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PRESGAR IMAGING OF CMI SOUTH, LC

HELEN COLLAZO AAO

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERT HOAG

Defendant Attorney

BENJAMIN FLOYD

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Addendum to

Addendum to

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed the attorney

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: SERVED - PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND INITIAL DISCOVERY SERVED WITH COMPLAINT

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND NOTICE OF E-MAIL DESIGNATION

 

Docket Entries

08/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND NOTICE OF E-MAIL DESIGNATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND INITIAL DISCOVERY SERVED WITH COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: SERVED - PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed the attorney

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023

FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Robert David Hoag; Amount: -185.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023

FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAddendum to

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Compliance; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest to Produce; Comments: TO DEFENDANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Admissions

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023

DocketCase Initiated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less