This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 07/08/2023 at 15:33:39 (UTC).

QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION vs. CARROLL BRADFORD INCORPORATED

Case Summary

On 05/09/2023 QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CARROLL BRADFORD INCORPORATED. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Vincent Falcone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************89-O

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Vincent Falcone

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION

Defendant

CARROLL BRADFORD INCORPORATED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAVI BATTA

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed to the Atty

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: CARROLL BRADFORD INCORPORATED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; Comments: CARROLL BRADFORD INCORPORATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed to the Atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketService Document Unable to be Issued; Comments: Per Admin Order No. 2021-04, a Standing Case Management Plan/Order for Streamlined or General civil cases must be submitted before summonses can be issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: ROSENFELD STEIN BATTA P.A.; Amount: -410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less