This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 06/16/2023 at 15:33:48 (UTC).

MIDFIRST BANK A FEDERALLY CHARTERED SAVINGS BANKet al. vs. MARTINEZ, MICHAEL Cet al.

Case Summary

On 04/17/2023 MIDFIRST BANK A FEDERALLY CHARTERED SAVINGS BANK filed an Other lawsuit against MARTINEZ, MICHAEL C. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Vincent S. Chiu. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************17-O

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Vincent S. Chiu

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MIDFIRST BANK A FEDERALLY CHARTERED SAVINGS BANK

MYA M HATCHETTE

Defendants

MICHAEL C MARTINEZ

ODETTE O RODRIGUEZ CLASS

LUIS E RODRIGUEZ REYES

U S DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MYA HATCHETTE

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Lis Pendens

Lis Pendens

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Answer

Answer; Comments: SENT TO THE JUDGE

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer; Comments: SENT TO THE JUDGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketService Document Unable to be Issued; Comments: Per Admin Order No. 2021-04, a Standing Case Management Plan/Order for Streamlined or General civil cases must be submitted before summonses can be issued. Please resubmit the proposed summons along with the Case management Order, separately.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Maynard Cooper Gale; Amount: -440.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 440.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLis Pendens

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less