This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 07/25/2023 at 15:42:21 (UTC).

SRP SUB LLC A DELAWARE LLCvs.JOSEPH HEPBURN, JR

Case Summary

On 05/26/2023 SRP SUB LLC A DELAWARE LLCvs JOSEPH HEPBURN, JR was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Evellen H Jewett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************90-O

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Evellen H Jewett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SRP SUB LLC A DELAWARE LLC

Defendant

JOSEPH HEPBURN JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL DAVIS

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing

Certificate of Mailing

Complaint

Complaint

Summons Issued 5 Day

Summons Issued 5 Day; Comments: EMAILED THE ATTORNEY

Certificate of Mailing

Certificate of Mailing; Comments: SENT VIA SASE

Stipulation

Stipulation; Comments: AND RELEASE OF ANY FUNDS ON DEPOSIT

Motion for Order

Motion for Order; Comments: APPROVING STIPULATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Order; Comments: APPROVING STIPULATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation; Comments: AND RELEASE OF ANY FUNDS ON DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing; Comments: SENT VIA SASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued 5 Day; Comments: EMAILED THE ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Mike G Davis; Amount: -195.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 195.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less