This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 07/21/2023 at 15:40:16 (UTC).

2018 4 IH BORROWER LPvs.UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION

Case Summary

On 05/22/2023 2018 4 IH BORROWER LPvs UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is David P Johnson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************13-O

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

David P Johnson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

2018 4 IH BORROWER LP

Defendant

UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL DAVIS

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Certificate of Mailing

Certificate of Mailing

Summons Issued 5 Day

Summons Issued 5 Day; Comments: emailed the attorney

Certificate of Mailing

Certificate of Mailing; Comments: SENT VIA SASE

Motion for Default to Court

Motion for Default to Court

Verification of Claim & Non-Military Service

Verification of Claim & Non-Military Service

Return of Service of Summons

Return of Service of Summons; Comments: UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION / POSTED

Final Judgment

Final Judgment; Comments: for possession

Order for Default

Order for Default

Writ of Possession Issued

Writ of Possession Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2023
  • DocketService Document Unable to be Issued; Comments: UNABLE TO ISSUE WRIT OF POSSESSION. WE NEED FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder for Default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Judgment; Comments: for possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service of Summons; Comments: UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION / POSTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVerification of Claim & Non-Military Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default to Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing; Comments: SENT VIA SASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued 5 Day; Comments: emailed the attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Mike G Davis; Amount: -195.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 195.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less