This case was last updated from Not Yet Classified on 05/22/2023 at 15:52:27 (UTC).

TRUHEALTH LLC vs. PEAK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 03/23/2023 TRUHEALTH LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PEAK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Not Yet Classified, Not Yet Classified located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Amanda S Bova. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************37-O

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Not Yet Classified

Judge Details

Judge

Amanda S Bova

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TRUHEALTH LLC

MARIA MENIN AAO

WEST ORANGE WELLNESS AND INJURY CENTER DBA

Defendant

PEAK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DALTON GRAY

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Addendum to

Addendum to

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed Atty

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Correspondence

Correspondence

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: SERVICE OF PROCESS AND ORIGINAL SUMMONS

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: PEAK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; Comments: PEAK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: SERVICE OF PROCESS AND ORIGINAL SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed Atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: BARR, CHAD ANDREW; Amount: -65.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 65.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less