This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 07/25/2023 at 15:47:59 (UTC).

MRI AND 3D DIAGNOSTIC CENTER LLC vs. SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/26/2023 MRI AND 3D DIAGNOSTIC CENTER LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew Bain. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************79-O

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Andrew Bain

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MRI AND 3D DIAGNOSTIC CENTER LLC

CORDALLIA CAMBELL AAO

Defendant

SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREGORY GUDIN

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Addendum to

Addendum to

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Landau Associates, P.A.; Amount: -310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less