This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 07/18/2023 at 16:00:17 (UTC).

AFO IMAGING INC vs. INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/19/2023 AFO IMAGING INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeanette D Bigney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************09-O

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Jeanette D Bigney

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AFO IMAGING INC

CARMEN HERNANDEZ MENDEZ AAO

ADVANCED DIAGNOSTIC GROUP DBA

Defendant

INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREGORY GUDIN

Defendant Attorney

AMANDA DURAN

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Addendum to

Addendum to

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: Served

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Landau Associates, P.A.; Amount: -65.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 65.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less