This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 10/18/2020 at 03:49:27 (UTC).

CARLSEN, LINDSAY vs. CARLSEN, RICHARD

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 CARLSEN, LINDSAY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CARLSEN, RICHARD. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Diana M. Tennis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************43-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Diana M. Tennis

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LINDSAY CARLSEN

Respondent

RICHARD CARLSEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CHRISTINA ALVAREZ

Respondent Attorney

AURORA MCCREARY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketMotion to Compel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information within Court Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Social Security

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketAffidavit of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Christina C. Alvarez; Amount: -418.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 418.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketPetition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDeclaration Under Uniform Child Custody Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information within Court Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Social Security

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketAmended Administrative Temporary Order Provided to Customer

    Read MoreRead Less