This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 04/23/2023 at 15:54:10 (UTC).

CAREFIRST IMAGING vs. UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

Case Summary

On 02/22/2023 CAREFIRST IMAGING filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeanette D Bigney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************71-O

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Jeanette D Bigney

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CAREFIRST IMAGING

DORINA BONNELL AAO

Defendant

UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREGORY GUDIN

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Landau Associates, P.A.; Amount: -65.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 65.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less