This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 07/22/2022 at 17:15:02 (UTC).

CAREFIRST IMAGING vs. CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/28/2022 CAREFIRST IMAGING filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Carly S Wish. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************96-O

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Carly S Wish

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CAREFIRST IMAGING

CHRISTOPHER SCOTT AAO

Defendant

CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREGORY GUDIN

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Addendum to

Addendum to; Comments: Administrative Order 2009-12-02

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: Amended Complaint

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Landau Associates, P.A.; Amount: -65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to; Comments: Administrative Order 2009-12-02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAREFIRST IMAGING is a litigant

Latest cases where CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gudin, Gregory E, ESQ.