This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/09/2023 at 20:28:47 (UTC).

CARDIER, WOLFGANG SCHULZE vs. LOVETT, CHRISTOPHER SCOTTet al.

Case Summary

On 12/30/2022 CARDIER, WOLFGANG SCHULZE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LOVETT, CHRISTOPHER SCOTT. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Denise Kim Beamer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************53-O

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Denise Kim Beamer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WOLFGANG SCHULZE CARDIER

Defendants

CHRISTOPHER SCOTT LOVETT

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TIFFANY FADDIS

Defendant Attorneys

MICHELE MORALES

TIMOTHY BENCH

 

Court Documents

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Summons Issued on Amended Complaint

Summons Issued on Amended Complaint; Comments: emailed to attorney

Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued on Amended Complaint; Comments: emailed to attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Daniel J. Newlin P.A.; Amount: -420.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 420.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less