This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 12/23/2018 at 03:48:19 (UTC).

CAPPS, DAISY MERCEDES vs. CAPPS, CASEY

Case Summary

On 11/29/2018 CAPPS, DAISY MERCEDES filed a Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CAPPS, CASEY. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Alice L Blackwell. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************48-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Alice L Blackwell

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DAISY MERCEDES CAPPS

Respondent

CASEY CAPPS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

MARTIN CORDELL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2018
  • Affidavit of Service Returned Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • Evidence Control Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Comprehensive Case History

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Comprehensive Case History

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Affidavit of Service Returned Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Court Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Final Order Permanent Injunction Recorded

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Final Order of Injunction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • HEARING - Injunctions - Blackwell, Alice L (Actual: Blackwell, Alice L)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Affidavit of Service Returned Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Temporary Order/Final Hearing Injunction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Notice of Social Security

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Notice of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less