This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 04/08/2023 at 16:25:21 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE, N.A.vs.STEVEN J FATULA

Case Summary

On 02/07/2023 CAPITAL ONE, N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STEVEN J FATULA. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth Gibson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************98-O

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Elizabeth Gibson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE, N.A.

Defendant

STEVEN J FATULA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOY KUNDAWALA

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Notice

Notice

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: emialed atty

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

Final Disposition Form

Final Disposition Form

Summons Returned Unserved

Summons Returned Unserved

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2023
  • HearingHearing: CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil - Gibson, Elizabeth; Location: Video/Audio/Tele Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • HearingHearing: CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil - Civil, Pretrial; Location: Video/Audio/Tele Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketHEARING - CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil - Civil, Pretrial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketHEARING - CANCELED-Cancelled Pre-Trial Civil - Gibson, Elizabeth

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Disposition Form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: emialed atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Robert Winter; Amount: -310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less