This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 06/21/2022 at 16:54:02 (UTC).

CANUEL CHIROPRACTIC & MASSAGE INC vs. GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/21/2022 CANUEL CHIROPRACTIC MASSAGE INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew Bain. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************76-O

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Andrew Bain

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CANUEL CHIROPRACTIC & MASSAGE INC

DONNA DITTO AAO

MELBOURNE CHIROPRACTIC SPINE AND INJURY CENTER DBA

Defendant

GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERT HOAG

Defendant Attorney

SARAH TANYHILL

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Addendum to

Addendum to

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued

Summons Issued; Comments: emailed to attorney

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: DEFENDANT, GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT AND DISCOVERY

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT AND DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: DEFENDANT, GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued; Comments: emailed to attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Robert David Hoag; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MELBOURNE CHIROPRACTIC SPINE INJURY CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where Government Employees Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SARAH TANYHILL