This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 06/16/2019 at 15:35:05 (UTC).

CANDELA CORPORATION vs. RAFA EYEBROW INC

Case Summary

On 04/17/2019 CANDELA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RAFA EYEBROW INC. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Patricia L Strowbridge. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************90-O

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Patricia L Strowbridge

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CANDELA CORPORATION

Defendant

RAFA EYEBROW INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RALPH MARCADIS

 

Court Documents

Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss; Comments: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: Rafa Eyebrow, Inc.

Complaint

Complaint

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed

Notice of Confidential Information within Court Filing

Notice of Confidential Information within Court Filing

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Dismiss; Comments: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Service; Comments: Rafa Eyebrow, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Confidential Information within Court Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Description: Payment; Payer: MARCADIS, RALPH SAM; Amount: -410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Candela Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marcadis, Ralph S