This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/05/2023 at 18:48:23 (UTC).

CAMPBELL, ROSALYNvs.SAMS EAST INC

Case Summary

On 08/25/2022 CAMPBELL, ROSALYNvs SAMS EAST INC was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Heather Pinder Rodriguez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************85-O

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Heather Pinder Rodriguez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROSALYN CAMPBELL

Defendants

SAMS EAST INC

SAMS CLUB 4828 DBA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JUAN ASCONAPA

Defendant Attorney

MICHELE MORALES

 

Court Documents

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Motion

Motion; Comments: TO ALLOW LATE RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAIL ATTORNEY

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, SAMS EAST, INC., A FOREIGN PROFIT CORPORATION D/B/A SAMS CLUB #4828

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, SAMS EAST, INC., A FOREIGN PROFIT CORPORATION D/B/ASAMS CLUB #4828

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address; Comments: COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion; Comments: TO ALLOW LATE RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAIL ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Schwed Law Firm; Amount: -410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, SAMS EAST, INC., A FOREIGN PROFIT CORPORATION D/B/A SAMS CLUB #4828

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT, SAMS EAST, INC., A FOREIGN PROFIT CORPORATION D/B/ASAMS CLUB #4828

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address; Comments: COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less