This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 01/16/2023 at 23:47:10 (UTC).

CADEN 1989 TIC I LLCvs.PERIS VAUGHN

Case Summary

On 04/27/2022 CADEN 1989 TIC I LLCvs PERIS VAUGHN was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth Gibson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************87-O

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Elizabeth Gibson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CADEN 1989 TIC I LLC

Defendant

PERIS VAUGHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAMES BARRON

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Summons Issued 5 Day

Summons Issued 5 Day; Comments: emailed atty

Certificate of Mailing

Certificate of Mailing

Answer

Answer; Comments: SENT TO JUDGE

Affidavit of Non Military/Proper Venue/Support Judgment

Affidavit of Non Military/Proper Venue/Support Judgment; Comments: for possession

Motion for Final Judgment

Motion for Final Judgment; Comments: default

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: served

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comments: JUNE 01, 2022 at 10:45 A.M.

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comments: amended-JUNE 01, 2022 at 10:30 A.M.

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

Order

Order; Comments: re: court hearing on 06.01.2022 on plaintiffs motion for final eviction hearing

 

Docket Entries

06/09/2022
View Court Documents

DocketOrder; Comments: re: court hearing on 06.01.2022 on plaintiffs motion for final eviction hearing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2022

HearingHearing: Hearing - DuBois, Eric H (Actual: DuBois, Eric H); Location: Room 14-A on the 14th Floor

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCourt Minutes

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2022

DocketHEARING - Hearing - DuBois, Eric H (Actual: DuBois, Eric H)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Hearing; Comments: amended-JUNE 01, 2022 at 10:30 A.M.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Hearing; Comments: JUNE 01, 2022 at 10:45 A.M.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: served

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2022
View Court Documents

DocketMotion for Final Judgment; Comments: default

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAffidavit of Non Military/Proper Venue/Support Judgment; Comments: for possession

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/09/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAnswer; Comments: SENT TO JUDGE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/02/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCertificate of Mailing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2022

FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: BARRON, JAMES IVY; Amount: -195.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2022

FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 195.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued 5 Day; Comments: emailed atty

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2022
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2022

DocketCase Initiated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less