This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 02/24/2022 at 10:05:23 (UTC).

BYRD , PATRICIA vs. SPORTSPLEX INC, ALL STARSet al.

Case Summary

On 10/05/2021 BYRD , PATRICIA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SPORTSPLEX INC, ALL STARS. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Denise Kim Beamer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************16-O

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Denise Kim Beamer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PATRICIA BYRD

C B A MINOR AKA

Defendants

ALL STARS SPORTSPLEX INC

MGV FLORIDA INC

ROGER MIKE

STEPHANIE MIKE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RYAN RUDD

Defendant Attorney

ROBERT MIKE

 

Court Documents

Order Denying Motion to Dismiss

Order Denying Motion to Dismiss; Comments: count IV

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss; Comments: DEFTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLTF COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE COUNT IV

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Response

Response; Comments: TO NOTICE OF PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM NON PARTY

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comments: 22nd day of February, 2022 at 8:45 AM EST.

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2022
  • HearingHearing: Ex Parte - Weiss, Kevin B. (Actual: Weiss, Kevin B.); Location: Video/Audio/Tele Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • HearingHearing: Ex Parte - Weiss, Kevin B. (Actual: Weiss, Kevin B.); Location: Video/Audio/Tele Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Denying Motion to Dismiss; Comments: count IV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketHEARING - Ex Parte - Weiss, Kevin B. (Actual: Weiss, Kevin B.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketHEARING - Ex Parte - Weiss, Kevin B. (Actual: Weiss, Kevin B.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss; Comments: DEFTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLTF COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE COUNT IV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse; Comments: TO NOTICE OF PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM NON PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: The Morgan Firm PA; Amount: -440.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 440.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBERT MIKE