This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/03/2019 at 15:32:02 (UTC).

BYRD, BEVERLYvs.GORMICAN, ROBERT et al.

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 BYRD, BEVERLYvs GORMICAN, ROBERT was filed as a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Keith A Carsten. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************35-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Keith A Carsten

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BEVERLY BYRD

Defendants

ROBERT GORMICAN

BARRY REITER

GRETCHEN VOSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAUL PERKINS

Defendant Attorney

A CAMERON

 

Court Documents

Answer

Answer

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E Mail Attorney

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E Mail Attorney

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E Mail Attorney

Complaint

Complaint

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E Mail Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E Mail Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E Mail Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Paul Perkins; Amount: -430.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 430.00

    Read MoreRead Less