This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 05/11/2021 at 15:38:31 (UTC).

BURKHOLDER, RYAN vs. WRIGHT, JUSTINet al.

Case Summary

On 03/12/2021 BURKHOLDER, RYAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against WRIGHT, JUSTIN. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey L Ashton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************17-O

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Jeffrey L Ashton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RYAN BURKHOLDER

Defendants

RING POWER CORPORATION

JUSTIN WRIGHT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAIGE STAUDENMAIER

 

Court Documents

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: JUSTIN WRIGHT

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: RING POWER CORPORATION

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Email sent to attorney

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Email sent to attorney

Complaint

Complaint; Comments: Count I, Count II

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; Comments: JUSTIN WRIGHT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; Comments: RING POWER CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Email sent to attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Email sent to attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Daniel J. Newlin P.A.; Amount: -420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint; Comments: Count I, Count II

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RING POWER CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STAUDENMAIER PAIGE S