This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/03/2019 at 15:33:05 (UTC).

BULA, RAFAELet al. vs. LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 BULA, RAFAEL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Patricia L Strowbridge. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************56-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Patricia L Strowbridge

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CARMEN BULA

RAFAEL BULA

Defendant

LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALEXANDRA RAMON

 

Court Documents

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Complaint

Complaint; Comments: Second

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Complaint

Complaint

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E Mail Attorney

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: JURY TRIAL

Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint; Comments: Second

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E Mail Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Alexandra Ramon; Amount: -410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    Read MoreRead Less