This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 01/30/2019 at 19:54:25 (UTC).

BUD HOLDINGS INCet al. vs. CASH TREE FUNDING LLCet al.

Case Summary

On 07/06/2016 BUD HOLDINGS INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CASH TREE FUNDING LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Kevin B. Weiss. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************80-O

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Kevin B. Weiss

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BUD HOLDINGS INC

ROBERT RUSSELL

Defendants

CASH TREE FUNDING LLC

ANDY TREUSCH

DONALD STEPHENS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEPHEN JONES

Defendant Attorneys

BRANDON BANKS

ANDY TREUSCH

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comments: February 6, 2019, at 8:30 a.m.

Motion for Final Judgment

Motion for Final Judgment

Notice

Notice; Comments: OF DROPPING MOTION FOR REHEARING

Response

Response; Comments: TO DEFENDANT ANDY TREUSCH S MOTION FOR REHEARING

Order

Order; Comments: for Response

Motion for Rehearing

Motion for Rehearing; Comments: Defendant, Andy Treusch

Order Granting

Order Granting; Comments: pltf's motion for summary judgment

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comments: NOVEMBER 2ND, 2018 @10:30 A.M.

Order Granting Motion to Quash

Order Granting Motion to Quash; Comments: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF PRODUCTION

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comments: August 1, 2018, at 8:30 a.m

Order of Reassignment

Order of Reassignment

Motion to Quash

Motion to Quash; Comments: DEFENDANT S NOTICE OF PRODUCTION

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce; Comments: Andy Treusch

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: DOCUMENTS

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: AND FILING AFFIDAVIT OF RONALD STEPHENS IN RESPONSE AND OPPOSITION OF PLTFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND FINAL JUDGMENT

167 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comments: February 6, 2019, at 8:30 a.m.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Final Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Comments: OF DROPPING MOTION FOR REHEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse; Comments: TO DEFENDANT ANDY TREUSCH S MOTION FOR REHEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Comments: for Response

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Rehearing; Comments: Defendant, Andy Treusch

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Granting; Comments: pltf's motion for summary judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • DocketHEARING - Summary Judgment - Weiss, Kevin B. (Actual: Weiss, Kevin B.)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comments: NOVEMBER 2ND, 2018 @10:30 A.M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
180 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibit(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibit(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibit(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibit(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibit(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • DocketDescription: Payment; Payer: Stephen Michael Jones; Amount: -430.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • DocketDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 430.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less