This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 12/22/2018 at 07:31:38 (UTC).

BROWN, KIMBERLY MARIE vs. BROWN, JEFFREY DOUGLAS

Case Summary

On 12/12/2018 BROWN, KIMBERLY MARIE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BROWN, JEFFREY DOUGLAS. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Diana M. Tennis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************29-O

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Diana M. Tennis

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KIMBERLY MARIE BROWN

Respondent

JEFFREY DOUGLAS BROWN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2018
  • Application for Determining Indigent Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Financial Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Parenting Plan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Notice of Social Security

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Answer & Counter Claim/Counter Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Summons Returned Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Summons Returned Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2018
  • Notice of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Application for Determining Indigent Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Amended Administrative Temporary Order Provided to Customer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 10.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: -418.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 397.50

    Read MoreRead Less