Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 04/05/2021 at 15:34:04 (UTC).

BROWN, KEVINvs.THE WENDYS COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/04/2021 BROWN, KEVINvs THE WENDYS COMPANY was filed as a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Vincent Falcone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************46-O

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Vincent Falcone

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KEVIN BROWN

Defendant

THE WENDYS COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NOAH STORCH

 

Court Documents

Notice

Notice; Comments: TO PLAINTIFF OF REMOVAL

Notice

Notice; Comments: OF REMOVED ACTION

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT AND CERTIFICATE OF GOOD FAITH

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Email sent to attorney

Complaint

Complaint; Comments: & Demand for Jury Trial

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Comments: TO PLAINTIFF OF REMOVAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Comments: OF REMOVED ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT AND CERTIFICATE OF GOOD FAITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Email sent to attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: STORCH, NOAH E; Amount: -410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint; Comments: & Demand for Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE WENDY'S COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STORCH, NOAH E