This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 04/22/2023 at 15:38:41 (UTC).

BROOKSIDE APTS LLCvs.EMRA MCCOY

Case Summary

On 02/21/2023 BROOKSIDE APTS LLCvs EMRA MCCOY was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Eric H DuBois. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************01-O

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Eric H DuBois

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BROOKSIDE APTS LLC

Defendant

EMRA MCCOY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RYAN VATALARO

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Exhibit(s)

Exhibit(s)

Exhibit(s)

Exhibit(s)

Summons Issued Hybrid

Summons Issued Hybrid; Comments: emailed Atty

Return of Service of Summons

Return of Service of Summons; Comments: EMRA MCCOY- POSTED

Certificate of Mailing

Certificate of Mailing

Motion for Default

Motion for Default

Affidavit of Non Military Service

Affidavit of Non Military Service

Motion for Final Judgment

Motion for Final Judgment; Comments: default

Entry of Default as to 5 Day

Entry of Default as to 5 Day; Comments: emailed atty

Final Judgment

Final Judgment

Writ of Possession Issued

Writ of Possession Issued; Comments: emailed atty

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued; Comments: emailed atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry of Default as to 5 Day; Comments: emailed atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Final Judgment; Comments: default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Non Military Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service of Summons; Comments: EMRA MCCOY- POSTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Hybrid; Comments: emailed Atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Atlas Law; Amount: -195.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 195.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibit(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibit(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less