This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 03/07/2023 at 15:41:41 (UTC).

BROOKSIDE APARTMENTS, LLCvs.JUAN RIVERA

Case Summary

On 01/06/2023 BROOKSIDE APARTMENTS, LLCvs JUAN RIVERA was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian Sandor. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************34-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Brian Sandor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BROOKSIDE APARTMENTS, LLC

Defendant

JUAN RIVERA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM (BILL) MCCABE

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Summons Issued 5 Day

Summons Issued 5 Day; Comments: emailed atty

Certificate of Mailing

Certificate of Mailing

Return of Service of Summons

Return of Service of Summons; Comments: JUAN RIVERA / POSTED

Stipulation

Stipulation

Order Approving Settlement

Order Approving Settlement; Comments: and Dismissing Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Approving Settlement and/or Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Approving Settlement; Comments: and Dismissing Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service of Summons; Comments: JUAN RIVERA / POSTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued 5 Day; Comments: emailed atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: MCCABE, WILLIAM (BILL) J; Amount: -195.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 195.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less