This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 05/10/2021 at 15:33:05 (UTC).

BRITO, ROSARIOvs.BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY OF FLORIDA

Case Summary

On 03/11/2021 BRITO, ROSARIOvs BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY OF FLORIDA was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Reginald K Whitehead. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************79-O

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Reginald K Whitehead

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROSARIO BRITO

Defendant

BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY OF FLORIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARLOS DIEZ-ARGUELLES

 

Court Documents

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Summons Issued on Amended Complaint

Summons Issued on Amended Complaint; Comments: Emailed to the Atty

Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Complaint

Complaint

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued on Amended Complaint; Comments: Emailed to the Atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: DIEZ-ARGUELLES, CARLOS RAUL; Amount: -10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Carlos Diez-Arguelles; Amount: -410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY OF FLORIDA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Diez-Arguelles, Carlos R