This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 06/29/2018 at 16:52:04 (UTC).

BRIGHTWOOD MANOR LLC vs. MIGUEL RODRIGUEZ, ALAN HENDRICKS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 03/08/2017 BRIGHTWOOD MANOR LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MIGUEL RODRIGUEZ, ALAN HENDRICKS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Faye L Allen. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************01-O

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Faye L Allen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BRIGHTWOOD MANOR MOBILE HOME PARK DBA

BRIGHTWOOD MANOR LLC

Defendants

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

ALAN HENDRICKS

MIGUEL RODRIGUEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALYSSA NOHREN

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

Notice of Dropping Parties

Notice of Dropping Parties

Order Setting Aside Judgment

Order Setting Aside Judgment; Comments: & Approving Stip

Stipulation

Stipulation; Comments: to Set Aside Final Judgment & for Settlement

Final Judgment

Final Judgment

Motion for Final Judgment

Motion for Final Judgment; Comments: (Pltfs) as to Count I

Entry of Default as to 5 Day

Entry of Default as to 5 Day

Motion for Default

Motion for Default; Comments: Miguel Rodriguez, Alan Hendricks, all unknown occupants

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: (Posted) Upon Miguel Rodriguez

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: (Posted) Upon All Unknown Occupants

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: (Posted) Upon Alan Hendricks

Motion for Default

Motion for Default; Comments: Clerk cannot issue default. Affidvits of Service as to each defendant listed on the proposed default are needed.

Affidavit of Non Military Service

Affidavit of Non Military Service

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: (Posted) Upon Alan Hendricks

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: (Posted) Upon All Unknown Occupants

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: (Posted0 Upon Miguel Rodriguez

Certificate of Mailing

Certificate of Mailing; Comments: Mailed to defts (3) SASE

Summons Issued 5 Day

Summons Issued 5 Day; Comments: emailed to atty

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Voluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Voluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Dropping Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Dropping Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order of Setting Aside/Vacating

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Setting Aside Judgment; Comments: & Approving Stip

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation; Comments: to Set Aside Final Judgment & for Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Final Judgment; Comments: (Pltfs) as to Count I

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Returned Served; Comments: (Posted0 Upon Miguel Rodriguez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Mailing; Comments: Mailed to defts (3) SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued 5 Day; Comments: emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued 5 Day; Comments: emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued 5 Day; Comments: emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • Description: Payment; Payer: NOHREN, ALYSSA M; Amount: -215.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 215.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NOHREN, ALYSSA