This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 02/17/2022 at 08:10:08 (UTC).

BRIGHTON PARK TOWNHOME HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC vs. MATTAMY FLORIDA LLC et al.

Case Summary

On 02/23/2021 BRIGHTON PARK TOWNHOME HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against MATTAMY FLORIDA LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Jeffrey L Ashton and John E Jordan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************27-O

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Jeffrey L Ashton

John E Jordan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Defendants and 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

BRIGHTON PARK TOWNHOME HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

CARROLL BRADFORD INCORPORATED

Defendants and 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

BATTERBEE ROOFING INC

QUALITY FIRST PAINT PROS LLC

MATTAMY ORLANDO LLC DBA MATTAMY HOMES

JADNA CONSTRUCTION LLC

SUNRISE CONSTRUCTION INTERNATIONAL INC

SUNSHINE STATE COATING INC

BRAVEN PAINTING INC

CARROLL BRADFORD INCORPORATED

THE ROOF DEPOT INC

ALLIANCE BUILDING MATERIAL SUPPLY INC

NINOS PROFESSIONAL PAINTING LLC

DENNIS R DILLS

SPECIALTY CONSTRUCTION DBA SPECIALTY CONSULTING

MATTAMY FLORIDA LLC

DEREK B MURRAY

MATTAMY ORLANDO LLC

SPECIALTY CONSULTING GROUP LLC

MATTAMY HOMES DBA

ALLIANCE PAVERS, LLC

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREG DEMERS

Defendant Attorneys

KYLE COSTELLO

JAMES KLOSS

TAYLOR DEVICE

KIMBERLY KELLEY

GARY TURNER

SANDRA KENNEDY

RICHARD RUSSO

ELIZABETH HOWANITZ

MARK GARRISON

MURIEL WHITEHEAD

BRYAN YARNELL

JOSE RODRIGUEZ

Other Attorneys

CHANG-HUI TSAI

ALEXANDER ALVAREZ

MICHAEL CHILDERS

MICHAEL MCSOLEY

WILLIAM WOODS

JENNIFER LUCY SHIPPOLE

ANDREW MARSHALL

 

Court Documents

Case Management Order

Case Management Order

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comments: MARCH 15, 2022 @8:30 A.M.

Response

Response; Comments: IN OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT - OMNIBUS

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: Third- Party Defendant, AKR CONSTRUCTION, INC

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Joint Case Management Report

Joint Case Management Report; Comments: AMENDED

Notice of Unavailability

Notice of Unavailability

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO FILE OPPOSITION TO AMENDED MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY AND COMPEL ARBITRATION

Order Enlargement and Extension of Time

Order Enlargement and Extension of Time

Letter

Letter

Notice of Acceptance

Notice of Acceptance; Comments: OF DEFENDANT, QUALITY FIRST PAINT PROS, LLC S PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Notice of Change

Notice of Change; Comments: LAW FIRM NAME

Return of Service of Summons

Return of Service of Summons; Comments: AKR CONSTRUCTION, INC

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO FILE OPPOSITION TO AMENDED MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY AND COMPEL ARBITRATION

Privilege Log

Privilege Log

364 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • HearingHearing: Case Management - Jordan, John E (Actual: Jordan, John E); Location: Court Room 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comments: MARCH 15, 2022 @8:30 A.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse; Comments: IN OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT - OMNIBUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketHEARING - Case Management - Jordan, John E (Actual: Jordan, John E)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: Third- Party Defendant, AKR CONSTRUCTION, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJoint Case Management Report; Comments: AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
403 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued on Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: DEMERS, GREG K; Amount: -170.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 170.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketService Document Unable to be Issued; Comments: Summons not filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Ball Janik LLP; Amount: -425.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 425.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint; Comments: and Demand for Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUNSHINE STATE COATING INC is a litigant

Latest cases where MATTAMY HOMES DBA is a litigant

Latest cases where BATTERBEE ROOFING INC is a litigant

Latest cases where ALLIANCE BUILDING MATERIAL SUPPLY INC is a litigant