This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 11/02/2019 at 15:32:51 (UTC).

BREF MASTERS COVE LLC vs. GIANINA GARCIA, DEVIN ZEIGLER

Case Summary

On 09/03/2019 BREF MASTERS COVE LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GIANINA GARCIA, DEVIN ZEIGLER. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Evellen H Jewett. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************63-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Evellen H Jewett

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BREF MASTERS COVE LLC

OAK RESERVE AT WINTER PARK AAO

Defendants

DEVIN ZEIGLER

GIANINA GARCIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAMES BARRON

 

Court Documents

Summons Returned Posted

Summons Returned Posted

Writ of Possession Issued

Writ of Possession Issued; Comments: emailed atty

Final Judgment

Final Judgment

Entry of Default as to 5 Day

Entry of Default as to 5 Day; Comments: emailed to atty

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: as to Gianina Garcia

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: as to Devin Zeigler

Affidavit of Non Military/Proper Venue/Support Judgment

Affidavit of Non Military/Proper Venue/Support Judgment

Complaint

Complaint

Certificate of Mailing

Certificate of Mailing; Comments: GIANINA GARCIA, DEVIN ZEIGLER

Summons Issued 5 Day

Summons Issued 5 Day; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Returned Posted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession Issued; Comments: emailed atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Entry of Default as to 5 Day; Comments: emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Service; Comments: as to Gianina Garcia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Service; Comments: as to Devin Zeigler

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Non Military/Proper Venue/Support Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Mailing; Comments: GIANINA GARCIA, DEVIN ZEIGLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued 5 Day; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • Description: Payment; Payer: BARRON, JAMES IVY; Amount: -195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BREF-MASTERS COVE, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JAMES BARRON