This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 02/19/2021 at 15:31:56 (UTC).

BOSTON LOBSTER FEAST INC vs. PFG SPECIALTY INC

Case Summary

On 06/30/2020 BOSTON LOBSTER FEAST INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PFG SPECIALTY INC. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are John Marshall Kest and John E Jordan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************58-O

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

John Marshall Kest

John E Jordan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BAR HARBOR LOBSTER COMPANY INC FKA

BOSTON LOBSTER FEAST INC

Defendant

PFG SPECIALTY INC

Counter Defendant

BOSTON LOBSTER

Counter Plaintiff

PFG SPECIALTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

KEVIN RECK

Defendant and Counter Plaintiff Attorney

SEAN WALSH

 

Court Documents

Order Denying Motion to Strike

Order Denying Motion to Strike; Comments: Affirmative Defenses

Order Denying

Order Denying; Comments: motion to dismiss and motion to strike

Notice

Notice; Comments: OF FULLY BRIEFED MOTION

Notice

Notice; Comments: OF FULLY BRIEFED MOTION

Notice

Notice; Comments: OF FULLY BRIEFED MOTION

Order Denying

Order Denying; Comments: motion for oral argument

Motion for Oral Argument

Motion for Oral Argument; Comments: ON MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM AND MOTION TO STRIKE AMENDED AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff PFG Specialty, Inc

Reply

Reply; Comments: IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT S AMENDED AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

Reply

Reply; Comments: IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS PFG SPECIALTY, INC. S AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM AND, IN THE ALTERNTIVE, MOTION TO STRIKE IMPERTINENT ALLEGATIONS

Opposition

Opposition; Comments: PFG Specialty Inc's Opposition to Boston Lobster Feast Inc's Motion to Strike Amended Affirmative Defenses

Opposition

Opposition; Comments: PFG Specialty Inc's Opposition to Boston Lobster Feast Inc's Motion to Dismiss Amended Counterclaim

Case Management Order

Case Management Order

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

Joint Case Management Report

Joint Case Management Report

Pay Balance Due

Pay Balance Due; Comments: E-Mailed to Atty.

Petition or Motion to Strike

Petition or Motion to Strike; Comments: DEFENDANT S AMENDED AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant, Boston Lobster Feast, Inc.

Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss; Comments: PFG SPECIALTY, INC. S AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM AND, IN THE ALTERNTIVE, MOTION TO STRIKE IMPERTINENT ALLEGATIONS - Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant, Boston Lobster Feast, Inc

Order Granting

Order Granting; Comments: verified motion for admission to appear pro hac vice

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery; Comments: responses and production to first sets of discovery and to overrule objections to document subpoena

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Denying Motion to Strike; Comments: Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Denying; Comments: motion to dismiss and motion to strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Comments: OF FULLY BRIEFED MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Comments: OF FULLY BRIEFED MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Comments: OF FULLY BRIEFED MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Denying; Comments: motion for oral argument

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Oral Argument; Comments: ON MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM AND MOTION TO STRIKE AMENDED AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff PFG Specialty, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply; Comments: IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT S AMENDED AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply; Comments: IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS PFG SPECIALTY, INC. S AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM AND, IN THE ALTERNTIVE, MOTION TO STRIKE IMPERTINENT ALLEGATIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder for Case Management Conference; Comments: 10/26/2020 10:15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Reassignment; Comments: to Business Court Div 43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Kasinda Wheeler; Amount: -410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Comments: and ADDENDUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PFG SPECIALTY INC F/K/A LARRY KLINE WHOLESALE MEATS AND PROVISIONS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where BAR HARBOR LOBSTER COMPANY INC FKA is a litigant

Latest cases where BOSTON LOBSTER FEAST INC is a litigant