This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 09/22/2022 at 15:33:02 (UTC).

BLACK DIAMOND FUNDING VENTURES LLCvs.OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/24/2022 BLACK DIAMOND FUNDING VENTURES LLCvs OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew Bain. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************19-O

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Andrew Bain

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BLACK DIAMOND FUNDING VENTURES LLC

RESTORATION FIRST SERVICES, CORP AAO

ANTONIO BARRECA AAO

Defendant

OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAILEY WILSON

Defendant Attorney

ANTHONY CALENZO

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Addendum to

Addendum to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: ELECTRONIC DELIVERY on Thursday, July 28, 2022 OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Motion to Compel Discovery

Motion to Compel Discovery; Comments: DEPOSITION OF CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE AND FIELD ADJUSTER, DETERMINE SEQUENCE, AND/OR SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

Order Enlargement and Extension of Time

Order Enlargement and Extension of Time

Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Stay

Motion to Stay; Comments: DISCOVERY PENDING RULING ON MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAIN

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Stay; Comments: DISCOVERY PENDING RULING ON MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Enlargement and Extension of Time

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery; Comments: DEPOSITION OF CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE AND FIELD ADJUSTER, DETERMINE SEQUENCE, AND/OR SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: ELECTRONIC DELIVERY on Thursday, July 28, 2022 OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: RINA FELD PA; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RESTORATION FIRST SERVICES CORP is a litigant

Latest cases where BLACK DIAMOND FUNDING VENTURES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Olympus Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CALENZO, ANTHONY