This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 03/06/2023 at 20:01:24 (UTC).

BIOHOME RESTORATIONS CORPvs.UNIVERSAL NORTH AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/04/2022 BIOHOME RESTORATIONS CORPvs UNIVERSAL NORTH AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is David P Johnson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************80-O

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

David P Johnson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BIOHOME RESTORATIONS CORP

JESUS ALVAREZ AAO

EUNICE VILLANERA AAO

Defendant

UNIVERSAL NORTH AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STACY NAPOLEON

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued

Summons Issued; Comments: emailed to attorney

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Voluntary Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued; Comments: emailed to attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Stacy Napoleon; Amount: -310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less