This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 03/13/2023 at 15:49:10 (UTC).

BEST ONE RESTORATIONS, LLCvs.CLEAR BLUE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 BEST ONE RESTORATIONS, LLCvs CLEAR BLUE INSURANCE COMPANY was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Eric H DuBois. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************84-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Eric H DuBois

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BEST ONE RESTORATIONS, LLC

MOISES A. FLOREZ AAO

SANDRA M. RAMOS AAO

Defendant

CLEAR BLUE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERT GONZALEZ

Defendant Attorney

GINA GLASGOW

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: TO DEFENDANT

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT

Addendum to

Addendum to

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss; Comments: PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss; Comments: PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Robert F Gonzalez Esq.; Amount: -310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; Comments: TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less