This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/07/2023 at 12:05:46 (UTC).

BERIDA, ANGELITAet al. vs. STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/27/2022 BERIDA, ANGELITA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey L Ashton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************58-O

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Jeffrey L Ashton

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ANGELITA BERIDA

FLORENTINA BERIDA

BERNANDO BERIDA

Defendant

STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARRINGTON JONES

Defendant Attorney

STEVEN CRUMBLY

 

Court Documents

Correspondence

Correspondence

Notice

Notice; Comments: OF ENTRY UPON LAND FOR INSPECTION

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Order Granting

Order Granting; Comments: Defendant's Motion to Permit Entry Upon Land

Motion to Compel Discovery

Motion to Compel Discovery

Correspondence

Correspondence

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Motion

Motion; Comments: TO PERMIT ENTRY UPON PLAINTIFFS LAND FOR INSPECTION

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: Privilege Log w/ attachment

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY- ELECTRONIC DELIVERY- 11/9/2022

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Comments: OF ENTRY UPON LAND FOR INSPECTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Granting; Comments: Defendant's Motion to Permit Entry Upon Land

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion; Comments: TO PERMIT ENTRY UPON PLAINTIFFS LAND FOR INSPECTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 10/27/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: The Law Office of Carrington Jones; Amount: -410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less