This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/03/2019 at 15:32:51 (UTC).

BENDER, JESSICA K vs. GARCIA, DAISY Let al.

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 BENDER, JESSICA K filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GARCIA, DAISY L. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Lisa T Munyon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************52-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Lisa T Munyon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JESSICA K BENDER

Defendants

BENIGNO GARCIA III

DAISY L GARCIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREGG ABEL

Defendant Attorney

THOMAS KNIGHT

 

Court Documents

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: DAISY L GARCIA

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: BENIGNO GARICA III

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E Mail Attorney

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E Mail Attorney

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: JURY TRIAL

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Service; Comments: DAISY L GARCIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Service; Comments: BENIGNO GARICA III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E Mail Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E Mail Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Gregg Abel; Amount: -420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 420.00

    Read MoreRead Less