This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/03/2019 at 15:33:15 (UTC).

BENCHMARK CONSULTING INC vs. SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 BENCHMARK CONSULTING INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Patricia L Strowbridge. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************63-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Patricia L Strowbridge

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BENCHMARK CONSULTING INC

RICA CHERUBIN AKA

CASTLE ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION DBA

RICA CHERUBIN AAO

Defendants

SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

SECURITY FIRST FLORIDA AKA

SECURITY FIRST FLORIDA DBA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAY KOVAR

Defendant Attorney

JEFFREY CARTER

 

Court Documents

Notice to Appear Returned Served

Notice to Appear Returned Served; Comments: SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: JURY TRIAL

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Privilege Log

Privilege Log

Objection

Objection; Comments: TO PLAINTIFF S INTERROGATORIES

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address; Comments: AND NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Complaint

Complaint

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E Mail Attorney

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Privilege Log

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Objection; Comments: TO PLAINTIFF S INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Designation of Email Address; Comments: AND NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Appear Returned Served; Comments: SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E Mail Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Jay Kovar; Amount: -410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    Read MoreRead Less