This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/03/2019 at 15:33:09 (UTC).

BENCHMARK CONSULTING INC vs. AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 BENCHMARK CONSULTING INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Lisa T Munyon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************57-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Lisa T Munyon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BENCHMARK CONSULTING INC

SUZIE AIME CHERUBIN AKA

SUZIE AIME CHERUBIN AAO

CASTLE ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION DBA

Defendant

AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAY KOVAR

Defendant Attorney

ALISON TREJO

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E Mail Attorney

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Notice to Appear Returned Served

Notice to Appear Returned Served; Comments: AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: JURY TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Appear Returned Served; Comments: AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E Mail Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Jay Kovar; Amount: -410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    Read MoreRead Less