Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 04/01/2021 at 17:01:01 (UTC).

BELLEVIEW IMAGING CENTER LLC vs. USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/08/2021 BELLEVIEW IMAGING CENTER LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Carly S Wish. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************43-O

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Carly S Wish

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BELLEVIEW IMAGING CENTER LLC

JENIFFER PATRICK AAO

Defendant

USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALYSON LADERMAN

Defendant Attorney

NICHOLAS FERREIRO

 

Court Documents

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing

Complaint

Complaint

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY.

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s); Comments: PLAINTIFF S NOTICE OF RULE 1.310(b)(6) DEPOSITION REQUEST.

Addendum to

Addendum to; Comments: CIVIL COVER SHEET.

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Bloodworth Law, PLLC; Amount: -65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition(s); Comments: PLAINTIFF S NOTICE OF RULE 1.310(b)(6) DEPOSITION REQUEST.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to; Comments: CIVIL COVER SHEET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BELLEVIEW IMAGING CENTER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where USAA Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ferreiro, Nicholas A.