Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 06/05/2021 at 15:56:27 (UTC).

BAUMAN CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC OF NORTHWEST FLORIDA PA vs. MERCURY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA

Case Summary

On 04/06/2021 BAUMAN CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC OF NORTHWEST FLORIDA PA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MERCURY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Amy J Carter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************92-O

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Amy J Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BAUMAN CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC OF NORTHWEST FLORIDA PA

LAURA KELLY AKA

LAURA KELLY AAO

Defendant

MERCURY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAD BARR

Defendant Attorney

GEORGE SHIREJIAN

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Reply to Affirmative Defenses; Comments: PLAINTIFF S REPLY TO DEFENDANT S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: defendant, Mercury Indemnity Company of America

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: SERVICE OF PROCESS & ORIGINAL SUMMONS

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: MERCURY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Email sent to attorney

Addendum to

Addendum to; Comments: CIVIL COVER SHEET COUNTY COURT ADDENDUM.

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Correspondence

Correspondence

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Affirmative Defenses; Comments: PLAINTIFF S REPLY TO DEFENDANT S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: defendant, Mercury Indemnity Company of America

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: SERVICE OF PROCESS & ORIGINAL SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: MERCURY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Email sent to attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Chad Barr; Amount: -90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to; Comments: CIVIL COVER SHEET COUNTY COURT ADDENDUM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bauman Chiropractic Clinic Of Northwest Florida, P.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Mercury Indemnity Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shirejian, George D