Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 04/03/2021 at 16:06:51 (UTC).

BAUMAN CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC OF NORTHWEST FLORIDA PA vs. GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/02/2021 BAUMAN CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC OF NORTHWEST FLORIDA PA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian F Duckworth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************19-O

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Brian F Duckworth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BAUMAN CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC OF NORTHWEST FLORIDA PA

RONALD BRYANT AAO

Defendants

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAD BARR

Defendant Attorney

MEGAN LINDSEY

 

Court Documents

Order Granting Substitution of Party

Order Granting Substitution of Party

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Motion for Protective Order

Motion for Protective Order; Comments: IN OPPOSITION TO DEDUCTIBLE ELECTION DISCOVERY AND DISCOVERY OF UNDERWRITING MATERIALS

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Joint Stipulation

Joint Stipulation; Comments: TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANT BY INTERLINEATION

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: DISCLOSURE, AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: em atty

Addendum to

Addendum to

Correspondence

Correspondence; Comments: pltf atty

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Granting Substitution of Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Protective Order; Comments: IN OPPOSITION TO DEDUCTIBLE ELECTION DISCOVERY AND DISCOVERY OF UNDERWRITING MATERIALS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJoint Stipulation; Comments: TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANT BY INTERLINEATION

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/02/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Chad Barr; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence; Comments: pltf atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim; Comments: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bauman Chiropractic Clinic Of Northwest Florida, P.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Government Employees Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEGAN LINDSEY