This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 12/31/2021 at 16:03:52 (UTC).

BAUMAN CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC OF NORTHWEST FLORIDA PA vs. GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/01/2021 BAUMAN CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC OF NORTHWEST FLORIDA PA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael Deen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************26-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Michael Deen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAUMAN CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC OF NORTHWEST FLORIDA PA

Defendants

GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

GEICO COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAD BARR

Defendant Attorney

DOMENICO TIRADO

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Correspondence

Correspondence

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Addendum to

Addendum to

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed Atty

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND DISCOVERY

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: DISCLOSURE, ND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: SERVICE OF PROCESS & ORIGINAL SUMMONS

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: SERVICE OF PROCESS & ORIGINAL SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: DISCLOSURE, ND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed Atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Chad Barr; Amount: -65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bauman Chiropractic Clinic Of Northwest Florida, P.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Government Employees Insurance Company is a litigant