Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 05/10/2021 at 15:47:46 (UTC).

BAUMAN CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC OF NORTHWEST FLORIDA PA vs. DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/11/2021 BAUMAN CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC OF NORTHWEST FLORIDA PA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Amy J Carter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************07-O

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Amy J Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BAUMAN CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC OF NORTHWEST FLORIDA PA

JENNIFER COUCH AAO

Defendant

DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAD BARR

Defendant Attorney

ERIC TOURIAN

 

Court Documents

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Reply to Affirmative Defenses; Comments: PLAINTIFF S REPLY TO DEFENDANT S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: SERVICE OF PROCESS & ORIGINAL SUMMONS

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed to attorney.

Addendum to

Addendum to; Comments: Cases Subject to Administrative Order 2009-12-02

Correspondence

Correspondence

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: Jury Trial Demanded

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Affirmative Defenses; Comments: PLAINTIFF S REPLY TO DEFENDANT S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: SERVICE OF PROCESS & ORIGINAL SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed to attorney.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Chad Barr; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to; Comments: Cases Subject to Administrative Order 2009-12-02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Comments: Jury Trial Demanded

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bauman Chiropractic Clinic Of Northwest Florida, P.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Direct General Insurance Company is a litigant