This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 03/06/2023 at 21:08:05 (UTC).

BATTERY MANAGEMENT LLC vs.HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/05/2022 BATTERY MANAGEMENT LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HERITAGE PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth Gibson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************89-O

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Elizabeth Gibson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BATTERY MANAGEMENT LLC

MIRIAM SANTANA AAO

Defendant

HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STACY NAPOLEON

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Summons to Show Cause

Summons to Show Cause; Comments: HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Addendum to

Addendum to; Comments: Administrative Order 2009-12-02

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice of Compliance

Notice of Compliance

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT

Notice of Propounding Interrogatories

Notice of Propounding Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Motion to Consolidate

Motion to Consolidate

Motion to Stay

Motion to Stay; Comments: DISCOVERY PENDING COURT'S RULING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

Notice

Notice; Comments: March 28, 2023 AT 2:00 pm ET

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Comments: March 28, 2023 AT 2:00 pm ET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Stay; Comments: DISCOVERY PENDING COURT'S RULING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Consolidate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Propounding Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Compliance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Stacy Napoleon; Amount: -185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to; Comments: Administrative Order 2009-12-02

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to Show Cause; Comments: HERITAGE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less