This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 03/14/2022 at 15:53:24 (UTC).

BATHESDA MEDICAL AND REHAB INC vs. INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/13/2022 BATHESDA MEDICAL AND REHAB INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Eric H DuBois. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************51-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Eric H DuBois

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BATHESDA MEDICAL AND REHAB INC AAO RODERICK FERGUS

BATHESDA MEDICAL AND REHAB INC

RODERICK FERGUS AAO

Defendant

INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MATTHEW QUATTROCHI

Defendant Attorney

RICHARD BEC

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Addendum to

Addendum to; Comments: administrative order 2009-12-02

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed issued summons to attorney

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice to Appear

Notice to Appear; Comments: of counsel

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear; Comments: of counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed issued summons to attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: QUATTROCHI, MATTHEW CHARLES; Amount: -65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to; Comments: administrative order 2009-12-02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Infinity Auto Insurance Company is a litigant